AZ SB1790 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; behavioral health residential facility
Title
Appropriation; behavioral health residential facility
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-2-3-0) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Administration
Ahcccs (h)
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Behavioral Health Residential Facility
Ahcccs (h)
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Behavioral Health Residential Facility