AZ SB1786 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-1-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-1-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prisoners; mental health transition program
Title
Prisoners; mental health transition program
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-1-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-15 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ahcccs (h)
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Definition
Definitions (h)
Delayed Repeal
Eligibility
Mental Health Transition Pilot Program
Mental Health Transition Program
Prisoners
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Program Eligibility
Recidivism
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Definition
Definitions (h)
Delayed Repeal
Eligibility
Mental Health Transition Pilot Program
Mental Health Transition Program
Prisoners
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Program Eligibility
Recidivism