AZ SB1783 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Small businesses; alternate income tax

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small businesses; alternate income tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-11HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-10HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2021-03-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-03-04HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-02-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-17SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2021-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431075New CodeSee Bill Text
431311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43302New CodeSee Bill Text
43583New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75928
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1783p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1783s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1783floormesnard.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484398
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485624
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486203
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486246
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486346
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487159
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487620
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487948
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75928&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75928&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75928&billStatusActionId=201644&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75928&billStatusActionId=202599&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75928&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments 750

feedback