AZ SB1739 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2872
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-22 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-22 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; 2022-2023.
Title
Transportation; 2022-2023.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-2-0) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2872 (Replaced by) 2022-06-28 - Chapter 322
Subjects
2022-2023
Allocation Of Monies
Arizona Game And Fish Department
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Exemption
Fleet Management
Fleet Operations Fund
Fleet Vehicle Replacement Fund
Fund
Game And Fish - Title 17
Retroactivity
Rural Transportation Fund
State Court Fleet Operations
State Match Advantage
Transportation
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicle Replacement Rate
Allocation Of Monies
Arizona Game And Fish Department
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Exemption
Fleet Management
Fleet Operations Fund
Fleet Vehicle Replacement Fund
Fund
Game And Fish - Title 17
Retroactivity
Rural Transportation Fund
State Court Fleet Operations
State Match Advantage
Transportation
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicle Replacement Rate
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 102.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 274 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 275 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 339 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 472 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |