AZ SB1726 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2816
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Chapter 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Chapter 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health care; 2023-2024.
Title
Health care; 2023-2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 139 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-05-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (49-10-0-0) |
2023-05-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-8-0-0) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2816 (Replaces) 2023-05-10 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
2023-2024
Administration
Administrative Action
Adoa (see Also: Department Of Administration)
Advisory Council
Ahcccs (see Also: Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System)
Ahcccs Transfer
Altcs (see Also: Arizona Long-term Care System)
Alzheimer's Disease State Plan
Annual Renewal Fee
Appropriating Monies
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (ahcccs)
Arizona Long-term Care System (altcs)
Arizona State Board Of Nursing
Budget Bills
Change Of Address
Clinical Rotation Program
Collaborative Care Uptake Fund
Competency Restoration
Counties
County Acute Care Contributions
County Contributions
County Expenditure Limitations
Definition
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
Dementia Awareness
Dementia Services Program
Department Of Administration (adoa)
Department Of Health Services (dhs)
Dhs (see Also: Department Of Health Services)
Disproportionate Share Payments
Exclusion
Failure To Renew
Federal Monies
Fiscal Year 2023-2024
Grant Program
Health Care
Hospital Interconnectivity
Implementation Of Program
Intent
Legislative Intent
Pilot Coverage Requirements
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Proposition 204
Psilocybin Research Grants
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rapid Whole Genome Sequencing
Report
Risk Contingency Rate Setting
Rules
Student Registered Nurse Anesthetist
Technical Assistance Grants
Technology Solution
Waivers
Administration
Administrative Action
Adoa (see Also: Department Of Administration)
Advisory Council
Ahcccs (see Also: Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System)
Ahcccs Transfer
Altcs (see Also: Arizona Long-term Care System)
Alzheimer's Disease State Plan
Annual Renewal Fee
Appropriating Monies
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (ahcccs)
Arizona Long-term Care System (altcs)
Arizona State Board Of Nursing
Budget Bills
Change Of Address
Clinical Rotation Program
Collaborative Care Uptake Fund
Competency Restoration
Counties
County Acute Care Contributions
County Contributions
County Expenditure Limitations
Definition
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
Dementia Awareness
Dementia Services Program
Department Of Administration (adoa)
Department Of Health Services (dhs)
Dhs (see Also: Department Of Health Services)
Disproportionate Share Payments
Exclusion
Failure To Renew
Federal Monies
Fiscal Year 2023-2024
Grant Program
Health Care
Hospital Interconnectivity
Implementation Of Program
Intent
Legislative Intent
Pilot Coverage Requirements
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Proposition 204
Psilocybin Research Grants
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rapid Whole Genome Sequencing
Report
Risk Contingency Rate Setting
Rules
Student Registered Nurse Anesthetist
Technical Assistance Grants
Technology Solution
Waivers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 923 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2981 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |