AZ SB1723 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HB2813

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Chapter 136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Commerce; 2023-2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commerce; 2023-2024.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-11SenateChapter 136
2023-05-11SenateGovernor Signed
2023-05-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-05-10SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-05-10HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (47-12-0-0)
2023-05-10HouseTransmit to House
2023-05-10SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (22-8-0-0)
2023-05-09SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2023-05-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-05-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-05-09SenateSenate read second time
2023-05-09SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-05-09SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2023-05-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-05-08SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2023-05-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2813 (Replaces) 2023-05-10 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43409Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/79709
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1723p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1723s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/laws/0136.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/509051
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/509544
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79709&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79709&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79709&billStatusActionId=218854&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79709&billStatusActionId=218888&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79709&billStatusActionId=218935&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback