AZ SB1719 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

State emergency council; membership; procedures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State emergency council; membership; procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-04-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-04-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-04-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-10HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-04HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-03HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-03HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-03-03HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-03-01HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2021-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-15SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2021-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
26304Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75861
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1719p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1719s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1719floorrios.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483989
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485840
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486609
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486877
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75861&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75861&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75861&billStatusActionId=201806&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75861&billStatusActionId=202031&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75861&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75861&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments 750

feedback