AZ SB1716 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona state hospital; admission; governance
Title
Arizona state hospital; admission; governance
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Governor Vetoed | |
2021-05-27 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-05-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-05-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-05-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-30 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-22 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-15 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-15-2-0) |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Admission (h)
Annual Report
Appointments
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
Arizona State Hospital
Assault Reduction And Response Plan
Compensation
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Health Services
Director Of Dhs
Discharge Plans
Duties
Governance (h)
Governor
Individualized Treatment Plans
Legislative Intent
Master Inpatient Treatment Plans
Membership
Psychiatric Security Review Board
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Request
Staffing Plan
State Hospital Governing Body
Storage Requirements
Surveillance System
Annual Report
Appointments
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
Arizona State Hospital
Assault Reduction And Response Plan
Compensation
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Health Services
Director Of Dhs
Discharge Plans
Duties
Governance (h)
Governor
Individualized Treatment Plans
Legislative Intent
Master Inpatient Treatment Plans
Membership
Psychiatric Security Review Board
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Request
Staffing Plan
State Hospital Governing Body
Storage Requirements
Surveillance System