AZ SB1714 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Chapter 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Chapter 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign expenditures; out-of-state; disclosures
Title
Campaign expenditures; out-of-state; disclosures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 379 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-28-0-0) |
2021-04-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Campaign Contributions
Campaign Expenditures
Campaign Expenses
Disclosure
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Out-of-state
Political Action Committees
Campaign Expenditures
Campaign Expenses
Disclosure
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Out-of-state
Political Action Committees