AZ SB1710 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter 201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter 201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State hospital; governing board; governance
Title
State hospital; governing board; governance
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. Janae Shamp [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Sen. Justine Wadsack [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Chapter 201 |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-06-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-12-2-0) |
2023-06-13 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2023-06-12 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (20-40-0-0) |
2023-06-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-06-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-06-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2023-03-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-13 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Acceptance Of Other Benefits
Accounts
Admission
Admission To State Hospital
Aggregate Mining
Agriculture - Title 3
Allocation Formula
Annual Licenses
Annual Report
Appointment
Appointments
Appropriating Monies
Arizona State Hospital
Arizona State Hospital (ash)
Arizona State Hospital Charitable Trust Fund
Ash (see Also: Arizona State Hospital)
Budget Request
Canteen
Chief Medical Officer
Compensation
Compensation Of Personnel
Conforming Legislation
Conservatorship
Contracts
Contracts And Lease Agreements
Cost Estimate
Costs
Counties - Title 11
Definition
Definitions
Department Of Health Services (dhs)
Deposits
Deputies
Director
Director Of State Hospital
Discharges
Duties
Duties Of Director
Effect
Effective Date
Emergency Members
Employees
Enforcement
Equipment
Exceptions
Expenditure Limit
Expenditures
Expenses
Facilities
Fees
Functions
Funded Capacity
Governance
Governing Board
Governing Board Duties
Hospital
Initial Terms
Inspections
Juveniles
Labor - Title 23
Lien
Local Programs
Mandatory Local Treatment
Maximum Security Area Required
Membership
Outside Entity
Parental Liability
Patient Ability To Pay
Patient Health Information
Per Capita Cost Limit
Persons With Intellectual Disabilities
Petition For Treatment (h)
Placement
Powers And Duties
Program Assessment
Property
Proposed Budget
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Public Hearing
Purpose
Qualifications
Regulation
Rental And Service Charges
Repeal
Repealing
Report
Reporting Requirements
Restriction On Regulation
Revocation
Rules
State Hospital
State Hospital Donations Fund
State Hospital Governing Board
Store
Succession
Transfer
Accounts
Admission
Admission To State Hospital
Aggregate Mining
Agriculture - Title 3
Allocation Formula
Annual Licenses
Annual Report
Appointment
Appointments
Appropriating Monies
Arizona State Hospital
Arizona State Hospital (ash)
Arizona State Hospital Charitable Trust Fund
Ash (see Also: Arizona State Hospital)
Budget Request
Canteen
Chief Medical Officer
Compensation
Compensation Of Personnel
Conforming Legislation
Conservatorship
Contracts
Contracts And Lease Agreements
Cost Estimate
Costs
Counties - Title 11
Definition
Definitions
Department Of Health Services (dhs)
Deposits
Deputies
Director
Director Of State Hospital
Discharges
Duties
Duties Of Director
Effect
Effective Date
Emergency Members
Employees
Enforcement
Equipment
Exceptions
Expenditure Limit
Expenditures
Expenses
Facilities
Fees
Functions
Funded Capacity
Governance
Governing Board
Governing Board Duties
Hospital
Initial Terms
Inspections
Juveniles
Labor - Title 23
Lien
Local Programs
Mandatory Local Treatment
Maximum Security Area Required
Membership
Outside Entity
Parental Liability
Patient Ability To Pay
Patient Health Information
Per Capita Cost Limit
Persons With Intellectual Disabilities
Petition For Treatment (h)
Placement
Powers And Duties
Program Assessment
Property
Proposed Budget
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Public Hearing
Purpose
Qualifications
Regulation
Rental And Service Charges
Repeal
Repealing
Report
Reporting Requirements
Restriction On Regulation
Revocation
Rules
State Hospital
State Hospital Donations Fund
State Hospital Governing Board
Store
Succession
Transfer
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 539 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |