AZ SB1708 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Motion picture production; tax credits
Title
Motion picture production; tax credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-7-2-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-1-0-0) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Motion Picture Production Program
Audit
Costs
Credit
Data Maintenance
Duties
Exemption From Rulemaking
Fee
Income Tax Credit Review Schedule
Income Tax Credits
Motion Picture Production
Postapproval
Preapproval
Purpose
Qualifications
Report
Rulemaking
Setoff For Debts
State Government - Title 41
Tax Credits
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Audit
Costs
Credit
Data Maintenance
Duties
Exemption From Rulemaking
Fee
Income Tax Credit Review Schedule
Income Tax Credits
Motion Picture Production
Postapproval
Preapproval
Purpose
Qualifications
Report
Rulemaking
Setoff For Debts
State Government - Title 41
Tax Credits
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1517 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 2003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1082 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1165 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |