AZ SB1704 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - House HHS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - House HHS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Government; vaccination mandate; prohibition
Title
Government; vaccination mandate; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | House HHS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2023-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-03-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Applicability
Definition
Definitions
Discriminatory Practices
Exceptions
Government
Legislative Intent
Lobbying
Prohibition
Prohibitions
Public Body
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Purpose
Registration And Regulation Of Lobbyists
State Government - Title 41
Strike Everything Amendment
Vaccination Mandate
Vaccinations
Definition
Definitions
Discriminatory Practices
Exceptions
Government
Legislative Intent
Lobbying
Prohibition
Prohibitions
Public Body
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Purpose
Registration And Regulation Of Lobbyists
State Government - Title 41
Strike Everything Amendment
Vaccination Mandate
Vaccinations