AZ SB1700 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - House read second time
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - House read second time
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; school libraries; books; prohibition
Title
Schools; school libraries; books; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | House read second time |
2023-03-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-03-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ade (see Also: Department Of Education)
Approval
Authority To Contract
Books
Common Schools
Course Of Study
Definition
Definitions
Delegation
Department Of Education (ade)
Education - Title 15
General Powers And Duties
High School
Immunity
Libraries
Library Books
Library Collection
List
Materials
Objectionable Books
Objectionable Materials
Objections
Parent Objections
Parental Access
Parental Involvement
Parental Objections (h)
Powers And Duties
Prohibited Books
Prohibition
Public Educational Institutions
Public Review
Public Schools
Removal
Rights Of Parents
School
School Libraries
Schools
Selection
Textbooks
Approval
Authority To Contract
Books
Common Schools
Course Of Study
Definition
Definitions
Delegation
Department Of Education (ade)
Education - Title 15
General Powers And Duties
High School
Immunity
Libraries
Library Books
Library Collection
List
Materials
Objectionable Books
Objectionable Materials
Objections
Parent Objections
Parental Access
Parental Involvement
Parental Objections (h)
Powers And Duties
Prohibited Books
Prohibition
Public Educational Institutions
Public Review
Public Schools
Removal
Rights Of Parents
School
School Libraries
Schools
Selection
Textbooks
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 189.07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 249.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 362 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 721 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 722 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |