AZ SB1685 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Veterans' donations fund; grants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans' donations fund; grants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2024-03-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2024-03-25HouseHouse consent calendar
2024-03-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2024-03-18HouseHouse MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-1-0-0-0-0)
2024-03-14HouseHouse read second time
2024-03-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2024-03-13HouseAssigned to House MAPS Committee
2024-03-13HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2024-03-12HouseTransmit to House
2024-03-11SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0)
2024-02-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2024-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2024-02-19SenateSenate consent calendar
2024-02-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2024-02-14SenateSenate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0)
2024-02-06SenateSenate read second time
2024-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2024-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate MAPS Committee
2024-02-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41608Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/81250
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/bills/sb1685p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/bills/sb1685s.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/514316
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/517972
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/518243
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=81250&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=81250&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=81250&billStatusActionId=225864&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=81250&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=81250&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback