AZ SB1680 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Newborn screening program; testing
Title
Newborn screening program; testing
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Pace [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-15 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-08 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ahcccs (h)
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Congenital Disorders
Department Of Health And Human Services
Department Of Health Services
Fee
Fees (h)
Implementation
Joint Legislative Budget Committee
Legislative Intent
Newborn Screening Program
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Testing
Uniform Screening Panel
United States Department Of Health And Human Services (h)
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Congenital Disorders
Department Of Health And Human Services
Department Of Health Services
Fee
Fees (h)
Implementation
Joint Legislative Budget Committee
Legislative Intent
Newborn Screening Program
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Testing
Uniform Screening Panel
United States Department Of Health And Human Services (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 694 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 694.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |