AZ SB1675 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prior felony conviction; aggravated DUI
Title
Prior felony conviction; aggravated DUI
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 60 |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-22-2-0) |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-1-0-0-0) |
2024-02-29 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-4-1-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Aggravated Dui
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definitions
Prior Felony Conviction
Prior Historical Felony Convictions
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definitions
Prior Felony Conviction
Prior Historical Felony Convictions