AZ SB1674 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marijuana dispensaries; registration transfer
Title
Medical marijuana dispensaries; registration transfer
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R] | Rep. Diego Espinoza [D] |
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Medical Marijuana Act
Dispensary Registration
Medical Marijuana Dispensaries
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Registration
Rfe
Three-fourths Vote
Transfer
Dispensary Registration
Medical Marijuana Dispensaries
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Registration
Rfe
Three-fourths Vote
Transfer