AZ SB1660 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Child sex trafficking; omnibus

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child sex trafficking; omnibus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-05-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-03-12HouseTransmit to House
2020-03-12SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2020-03-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2020-02-25SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-02-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-20SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2020-02-06SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2020-02-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12283Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
131401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133827Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134254New CodeSee Bill Text
13705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15245New CodeSee Bill Text
411758.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411758.07Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8514Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback