AZ SB1657 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Senate ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Senate ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Graduation; statewide assessment; requirements
Title
Graduation; statewide assessment; requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Academic Credit
Arizona Online Instruction
Education - Title 15
Fees
Graduation
High Schools
Report
Requirements
School Curricula
Statewide Assessment
Transfer From Other Schools
Arizona Online Instruction
Education - Title 15
Fees
Graduation
High Schools
Report
Requirements
School Curricula
Statewide Assessment
Transfer From Other Schools
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 701.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 808 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |