AZ SB1652 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; attorney general; investigation; litigation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; attorney general; investigation; litigation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-25HouseHouse GE Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-11HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-10HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2021-03-10HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-03-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-03-08HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-08SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-03-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-03-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-24SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-11SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2021-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75785
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1652p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1652s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.1652cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.1652appropriations.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483644
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488093
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488351
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75785&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75785&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75785&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75785&billStatusActionId=202802&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75785&billStatusActionId=202910&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75785&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75785&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4

Bill Comments 750

feedback