AZ SB1650 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Chapter 40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Auditor general; duties; access

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Auditor general; duties; access

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-12SenateChapter 40
2023-04-12SenateGovernor Signed
2023-04-06SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-04-06SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (25-5-0-0)
2023-04-06SenateSenate concurs
2023-04-04SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2023-04-04SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2023-03-30SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-03-30HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2023-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-03-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2023-03-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2023-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2023-03-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-03-15HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2023-03-08HouseHouse read second time
2023-03-07HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-03-07HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2023-03-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-03-03HouseTransmit to House
2023-03-02SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2023-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-02-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-02-16SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2023-02-09SenateSenate read second time
2023-02-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-02-02SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411278Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.04Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.06Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.07Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.21Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.22Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
412954Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/79338
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1650p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1650s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1650h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/laws/0040.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/S.1650HOFFMAN.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/adopted/S.1650GOV.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/H.1650DUNN.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/adopted/H.1650GOVERNMENT.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504094
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504846
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504847
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/505758
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506593
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506800
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507379
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507815
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507936
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508320
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79338&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79338&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79338&billStatusActionId=216853&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79338&billStatusActionId=217079&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79338&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79338&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79338&billStatusActionId=218212&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79338&billStatusActionId=218236&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79338&billStatusActionId=218389&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79338&billStatusActionId=218396&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback