AZ SB1643 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Research; development; tax credits
Title
Research; development; tax credits
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-24 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (11-18-1-0) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-2-1-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Aca (see Also: Arizona Commerce Authority) (h)
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations (h)
Arizona Commerce Authority (aca) (h)
Arizona Reinvestment Fund Act
Delayed Repeal
Development
Economic Analysis
Reinvestment
Report
Research
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Tax Credits
Unused Income Tax Credits
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations (h)
Arizona Commerce Authority (aca) (h)
Arizona Reinvestment Fund Act
Delayed Repeal
Development
Economic Analysis
Reinvestment
Report
Research
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Tax Credits
Unused Income Tax Credits