AZ SB1636 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Chapter 285
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Chapter 285
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Legislative drafting requirements; repeal
Title
Legislative drafting requirements; repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 285 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2021-04-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Child Safety - Title 8
Conforming Legislation
Education - Title 15
Game And Fish - Title 17
Information Technology - Title 18
Insurance - Title 20
Labor - Title 23
Legislative Drafting Requirements
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Program And Committee Termination
Public Finances - Title 35
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Public Lands - Title 37
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
The Environment - Title 49
Transportation - Title 28
Waters - Title 45
Welfare - Title 46
Conforming Legislation
Education - Title 15
Game And Fish - Title 17
Information Technology - Title 18
Insurance - Title 20
Labor - Title 23
Legislative Drafting Requirements
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Program And Committee Termination
Public Finances - Title 35
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Public Lands - Title 37
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
The Environment - Title 49
Transportation - Title 28
Waters - Title 45
Welfare - Title 46
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 154 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1785 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1855 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1867 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1868 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 249.06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 249.09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 249.15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 258 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 259 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
18 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
18 | 612 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 3505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 432 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2942 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 199 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 779 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 797.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 483 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1279 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1292 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1604.18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1732 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 179 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1829 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 4257 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5356 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5612 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 610.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 353 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 908 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 255.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 256.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 257.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 457.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |