AZ SB1613 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-30 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Election data; results; election equipment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election data; results; election equipment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-06-30HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-03-04HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-03-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2021-02-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-15SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0)
2021-02-02SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16404.01New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75738
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1613p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1613s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.1613townsend.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.1613kavanagh2.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483984
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487709
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75738&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75738&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75738&billStatusActionId=201987&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75738&billStatusActionId=202333&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75738&billStatusActionId=202595&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback