AZ SB1602 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Dental anesthesia; requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental anesthesia; requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-20SenateChapter 200
2023-06-20SenateGovernor Signed
2023-06-14SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-13SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (20-8-2-0)
2023-06-13SenateSenate concurs
2023-06-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2023-06-13SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2023-05-16SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-05-15HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (47-11-1-0)
2023-04-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-04-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2023-04-04HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2023-04-04HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-03-27HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
2023-03-21HouseHouse read second time
2023-03-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-03-20HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2023-03-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-03-14HouseTransmit to House
2023-03-14SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
2023-03-13SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-02-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-02-16SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2023-02-09SenateSenate read second time
2023-02-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-02-02SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321272New CodeSee Bill Text
321403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321459New CodeSee Bill Text
321606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321664Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321855.02New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/79283
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1602p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1602s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1602h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/laws/0200.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/H.1602MONTENEGRO.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/adopted/H.1602HEALTH HUMAN SERVICES.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504076
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506554
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507366
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507697
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508909
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/509386
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/509997
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79283&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79283&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79283&billStatusActionId=217696&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79283&billStatusActionId=217727&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79283&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79283&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79283&billStatusActionId=218657&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79283&billStatusActionId=219031&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79283&billStatusActionId=219343&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79283&billStatusActionId=219420&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback