AZ SB1598 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Information technology; security; office
Title
Information technology; security; office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Chapter 50 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-03-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-14 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-08 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Department Of Homeland Security (azdohs)
Azdohs (see Also: Arizona Department Of Homeland Security)
Budget Units
Classification
Duties
Information
Information Technology
Information Technology - Title 18
Infrastructure
Office
Powers
Repeal (h)
Retention Of Members
Security
State Government - Title 41
Statewide Information Security And Privacy Office
Suspension
Violation
Azdohs (see Also: Arizona Department Of Homeland Security)
Budget Units
Classification
Duties
Information
Information Technology
Information Technology - Title 18
Infrastructure
Office
Powers
Repeal (h)
Retention Of Members
Security
State Government - Title 41
Statewide Information Security And Privacy Office
Suspension
Violation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
18 | 105 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
18 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 4252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 4253 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 4254 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 4255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 4256 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 4257 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 4258 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |