AZ SB1596 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Chapter 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Chapter 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Off-highway vehicle study committee
Title
Off-highway vehicle study committee
Sponsors
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 148 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-04-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (41-11-8-0) |
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-23 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-2-0-0) |
2022-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adot (see Also: Department Of Transportation)
Annual Reports
Arizona Game And Fish Department
Arizona Off-highway Vehicle Study Committee
Arizona State Parks Board
Definition
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Duties
Education Materials
Exception
Indicia
Membership
Off-highway Vehicle Recreation Fund
Off-highway Vehicle Study Committee
Off-highway Vehicle User Fee
Off-highway Vehicles
Registration
Rental Companies
Report
State Trust Land Recreational Permit
Study Committee (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Annual Reports
Arizona Game And Fish Department
Arizona Off-highway Vehicle Study Committee
Arizona State Parks Board
Definition
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Duties
Education Materials
Exception
Indicia
Membership
Off-highway Vehicle Recreation Fund
Off-highway Vehicle Study Committee
Off-highway Vehicle User Fee
Off-highway Vehicles
Registration
Rental Companies
Report
State Trust Land Recreational Permit
Study Committee (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1176 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1177 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1182 | New Code | See Bill Text |