AZ SB1594 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-13 - Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (15-13-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

License plates; special plates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License plates; special plates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - Motion Representative Payne motion that the House suspend Rule 32 and notwithstanding any other House Rule and that SB1594 be placed under the order of business for Third Reading of bills today. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), SB1594 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-13SenateSenate final reading FAILED, voting: (15-13-2-0)
2023-06-13SenateSenate concurs
2023-06-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2023-06-13SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2023-06-13SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-06-13HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (44-14-2-0)
2023-06-13HouseHouse miscellaneous motion: Representative Payne motion that the House suspend Rule 32 and notwithstanding any other House Rule and that SB1594 be placed under the order of business for Third Reading of bills today.
2023-06-12HouseHouse motion to reconsider third reading
2023-06-12HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (10-50-0-0)
2023-06-12HouseHouse additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-06-12HouseHouse refer to additional Committee of the Whole
2023-04-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-04-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2023-04-04HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2023-04-04HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2023-03-29HouseHouse TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0)
2023-03-08HouseHouse read second time
2023-03-07HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-03-07HouseAssigned to House TI Committee
2023-03-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-03-02HouseTransmit to House
2023-03-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0)
2023-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-02-13SenateSenate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2023-02-09SenateSenate read second time
2023-02-06SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-02-06SenateAssigned to Senate TAT Committee
2023-02-06SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
282351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282416Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282470.18New CodeSee Bill Text
286501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
286991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
286993Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/79267
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1594p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1594s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1594h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/S.1594HATATHLIE.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/adopted/S.1594TAT.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/H.1594COOK.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/adopted/H.1594TRANSPORTATION INFRASTRUCTURE.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503613
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504193
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506955
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507852
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508469
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/509878
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/509867
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79267&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79267&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79267&billStatusActionId=216797&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79267&billStatusActionId=216932&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79267&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79267&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79267&billStatusActionId=218458&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79267&billStatusActionId=219209&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79267&billStatusActionId=219211&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79267&billStatusActionId=219251&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79267&billStatusActionId=219285&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79267&billStatusActionId=219312&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79267&billStatusActionId=219366&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79267&billStatusActionId=219402&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79267&billStatusActionId=219404&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback