AZ SB1593 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Early voting; time limits; envelope
Title
Early voting; time limits; envelope
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-1-0) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 542 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 547 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 558.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 579 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |