AZ SB1591 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Study committee; nurse continued competency
Title
Study committee; nurse continued competency
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Pace [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-2-0) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Application
Appropriation
Arizona State Board Of Nursing
Continuing Education
Delayed Repeal
Documentation
Establishment
License Or Certification Renewal
Nurse Continued Competency
Nurses
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Report
Requirements
Strike Everything Amendment
Study Committee
Appropriation
Arizona State Board Of Nursing
Continuing Education
Delayed Repeal
Documentation
Establishment
License Or Certification Renewal
Nurse Continued Competency
Nurses
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Report
Requirements
Strike Everything Amendment
Study Committee