AZ SB1585 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Military operations; real estate disclosure
Title
Military operations; real estate disclosure
Sponsors
Sen. John Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-03-21 | House read second time | |
2011-03-17 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-03 | Senate third reading , voting: (26-0-4-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Consent Calendar February 23, 2011 @ 1:35 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Senate VMA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate VMA Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate VMA Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |