AZ SB1577 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - House read second time
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - House read second time
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Probate; mediation; jury trials
Title
Probate; mediation; jury trials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Bench Trial
Civil Penalties
Jury Trial
Jury Trials
Mediation
Probate
Probate Jurisdiction Of Courts
Repeal
Repealing
Trusts, Estates And Protective Proceedings - Title 14
Civil Penalties
Jury Trial
Jury Trials
Mediation
Probate
Probate Jurisdiction Of Courts
Repeal
Repealing
Trusts, Estates And Protective Proceedings - Title 14