AZ SB1575 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax exemptions; statutory conformity
Title
Property tax exemptions; statutory conformity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Conditional Enactment
Definitions
Department Of Revenue
Department Of Veterans Affairs
Disabled Veterans'
Education - Title 15
Homeowner Property Taxes
Permanent Disability
Property Tax
Property Tax Exemptions
Residential Property
Statutory Conformity
Taxation - Title 42
Veterans
Widows And Widowers
Definitions
Department Of Revenue
Department Of Veterans Affairs
Disabled Veterans'
Education - Title 15
Homeowner Property Taxes
Permanent Disability
Property Tax
Property Tax Exemptions
Residential Property
Statutory Conformity
Taxation - Title 42
Veterans
Widows And Widowers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 11111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 11127 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 11152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 15053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |