AZ SB1569 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacy technician trainees; pharmacists; compounding
Title
Pharmacy technician trainees; pharmacists; compounding
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Senate | Chapter 362 |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (20-4-6-0) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-06-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-3-2-0) |
2022-06-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-21 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona State Board Of Pharmacy
Compound Drugs
Compounding
Confidential Information
Disciplinary Action
Disclosures
Licensees
Permittees
Pharmacist
Pharmacists
Pharmacy Intern
Pharmacy Technician
Pharmacy Technician Trainees
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Qualifications
Registration
Remote Dispensing Pharmacies
Unethical And Unprofessional Conduct
Compound Drugs
Compounding
Confidential Information
Disciplinary Action
Disclosures
Licensees
Permittees
Pharmacist
Pharmacists
Pharmacy Intern
Pharmacy Technician
Pharmacy Technician Trainees
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Qualifications
Registration
Remote Dispensing Pharmacies
Unethical And Unprofessional Conduct
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1901.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1921.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1923.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1924 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1927 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1927.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1927.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1934 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1996 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |