AZ SB1567 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Justification; criminal offenses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Justification; criminal offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-10HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2020-03-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-02-20HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0)
2020-02-18SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-02-17SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-13SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2020-02-05SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-04SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2020-02-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
13401Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback