AZ SB1559 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Native American veterans; tax settlement
Title
Native American veterans; tax settlement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-3-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
2022
Annual Report
Claims
Native American Veterans
Native Americans Veterans Tax Settlement
Repeal
Requirements
Retroactivity
Settlement Fund
Tax Settlement
Veterans' Income Tax
Annual Report
Claims
Native American Veterans
Native Americans Veterans Tax Settlement
Repeal
Requirements
Retroactivity
Settlement Fund
Tax Settlement
Veterans' Income Tax