AZ SB1553 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Legislation replaced by HB2754

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Health; budget reconciliation; 2019-2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; budget reconciliation; 2019-2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-05-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2019-05-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-05-22SenateSenate read second time
2019-05-22SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2019-05-21SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-05-21SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2019-05-21SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2754 (Replaced by) 2019-05-31 - Chapter 270

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
134512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36273Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362903.12New CodeSee Bill Text
362903.13New CodeSee Bill Text
362985Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36405.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36425.06New CodeSee Bill Text
36540Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36550.05Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36550.09New CodeSee Bill Text
36773Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback