AZ SB1551 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Driver license suspensions; restrictions
Title
Driver license suspensions; restrictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Chapter 189 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Civil Penalty
Civil Traffic Violation
Commercial Driver License (h)
Criminal Code - Title 13
Driver License Suspensions
Driving Privileges
Exception
Failure To Appear
Failure To Pay (h)
Fine
Fines (h)
Mandatory Suspension
Mitigation (h)
Restrictions
Surcharges (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Waiver (h)
Civil Traffic Violation
Commercial Driver License (h)
Criminal Code - Title 13
Driver License Suspensions
Driving Privileges
Exception
Failure To Appear
Failure To Pay (h)
Fine
Fines (h)
Mandatory Suspension
Mitigation (h)
Restrictions
Surcharges (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Waiver (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3482 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |