AZ SB1550 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Legislation replaced by HB2751

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Budget procedures; budget reconciliation; 2019-2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget procedures; budget reconciliation; 2019-2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-05-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2019-05-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-05-22SenateSenate read second time
2019-05-22SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2019-05-21SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-05-21SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2019-05-21SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2751 (Replaced by) 2019-05-31 - Chapter 267

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16168.01New CodeSee Bill Text
18305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
18401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
18421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28414New CodeSee Bill Text
35112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35173Amended CodeSee Bill Text
415356Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41740.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
421122Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72438
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1550p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1550s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1550floorfann.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1550quezada1227.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72438&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72438&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72438&billStatusActionId=189816&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72438&billStatusActionId=189820&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback