AZ SB1549 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2748
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Capital outlay; appropriations; 2019-2020
Title
Capital outlay; appropriations; 2019-2020
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2748 (Replaced by) 2019-05-31 - Chapter 264
Subjects
Adot
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Arizona Game And Fish Department
Arizona State Lottery Commission
Budget Bills
Capital Outlay
Department Of Administration
Department Of Corrections
Department Of Juvenile Corrections
Department Of Transportation
Doa
Doc
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Arizona Game And Fish Department
Arizona State Lottery Commission
Budget Bills
Capital Outlay
Department Of Administration
Department Of Corrections
Department Of Juvenile Corrections
Department Of Transportation
Doa
Doc