AZ SB1537 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Chapter 135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Service providers; fingerprint card

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Service providers; fingerprint card

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateChapter 135
2019-04-24SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-18SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-04-17HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2019-04-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-08HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-04-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-28HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-03-11HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-07HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-07HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-03-04HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0)
2019-02-07SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411758Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
411758.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41619.51Amended CodeSee Bill Text
46141Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72210
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1537p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1537s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0135.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1537floorbrophy mcgee.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72210&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72210&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72210&billStatusActionId=187345&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72210&billStatusActionId=187638&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72210&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72210&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72210&billStatusActionId=189013&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback