AZ SB1534 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Annuity disclosure; rules

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annuity disclosure; rules

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateChapter 223
2019-05-13SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-07SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-07SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (29-0-1-0)
2019-05-07SenateSenate concurs
2019-05-07SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2019-05-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2019-05-06SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-06HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-26HouseHouse COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-03-06HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-02-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-02-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-20SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0)
2019-02-07SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201242.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
201242.06New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72207
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1534p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1534s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1534h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0223.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1534weninger.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1534weninger2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1534commerce.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72207&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72207&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72207&billStatusActionId=187741&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72207&billStatusActionId=187942&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72207&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72207&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72207&billStatusActionId=189367&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72207&billStatusActionId=189371&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72207&billStatusActionId=189439&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72207&billStatusActionId=189448&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback