AZ SB1529 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education programs; county jails; appropriation..
Title
Education programs; county jails; appropriation..
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-08 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
County Jail (h)
County Jail Education Programs
County Jails
Diploma
Education - Title 15
Education Programs
General Equivalency Diploma (h)
High School Diploma (h)
Superintendent Of Public Instruction
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
County Jail (h)
County Jail Education Programs
County Jails
Diploma
Education - Title 15
Education Programs
General Equivalency Diploma (h)
High School Diploma (h)
Superintendent Of Public Instruction