AZ SB1528 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HB2575

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Higher education; 2023-2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education; 2023-2024.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-16 Governor Vetoed
2023-02-15 Transmitted to Governor
2023-02-13SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-02-13HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0)
2023-02-01HouseTransmit to House
2023-02-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2023-02-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2023-01-31SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-01-31SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-01-31SenateSenate read second time
2023-01-31SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-01-31SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2023-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2023-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2575 (Replaces) 2023-02-06 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/79195
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1528p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1528s.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/502436
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504388
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504594
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504749
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508256
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/509611
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79195&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79195&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79195&billStatusActionId=214307&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79195&billStatusActionId=214317&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79195&billStatusActionId=215630&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback