AZ SB1526 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2659
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; budget reconciliation; 2018-2019
Title
Health; budget reconciliation; 2018-2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Sen Hobbs to include the Hobbs flr. amend (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Motion Sen Hobbs to include the Hobbs flr. amend (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Motion Sen Hobbs to include the Hobbs flr. amend (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate motion to amend |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0) |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2659 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Chapter 284
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 654 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 658 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2805 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2823 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2905.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2921 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |