AZ SB1524 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Assigned to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Assigned to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Nursing shortage; plan; pilot program
Title
Nursing shortage; plan; pilot program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | House ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-04-01 | House | House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HEWD Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |