AZ SB1523 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HB2764

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Mental health omnibus

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health omnibus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03SenateChapter 4
2020-03-03SenateGovernor Signed
2020-03-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2020-03-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-03-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2020-03-03HouseTransmit to House
2020-03-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2020-03-03SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-03-03SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-03SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-02SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-25SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2020-02-19SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2020-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2020-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2020-02-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2764 (Replaces) 2020-03-03 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201138New CodeSee Bill Text
20157.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
363436New CodeSee Bill Text
363504Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73859
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1523p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1523s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/laws/0004.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.1523brophy mcgee.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1523hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.15230238.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1523approp.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1523floorbrophy mcgee.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73859&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73859&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73859&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73859&billStatusActionId=195054&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73859&billStatusActionId=195057&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73859&billStatusActionId=195071&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback