AZ SB1517 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-16)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Chapter 172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State dinosaur; Sonorasaurus

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State dinosaur; Sonorasaurus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateChapter 172
2018-04-10SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (55-2-3-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-08HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-02-28HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-22HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-14SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41860.05New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70727
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1517p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1517s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0172.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1517mendez0455.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1517salman.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70727&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70727&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70727&billStatusActionId=181537&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70727&billStatusActionId=181644&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70727&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70727&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70727&billStatusActionId=182902&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback