AZ SB1516 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Chapter 79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Campaign finance amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign finance amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 23 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-29 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 23 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-29 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 23 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-29 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 23 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-29 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 25 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (Y: 24 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 10 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 10 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 10 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 10 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 10 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-30 Chapter 79
2016-03-30 Governor Signed
2016-03-30 Transmitted to Governor
2016-03-30HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-03-29HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0)
2016-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2016-03-24HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-1-0)
2016-03-09HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-03-15HouseHouse ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0-0)
2016-03-10HouseReferred to House ELECT Committee
2016-03-10HouseHouse read second time
2016-03-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-03-09HouseAssigned to House ELECT Committee
2016-03-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-03-09SenateTransmit to House
2016-03-08SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (18-10-2-0)
2016-03-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment
2016-02-02SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-18SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2016-02-02SenateReferred to Senate JUD Committee
2016-02-17SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2016-02-03SenateReferred to Senate GOV Committee
2016-02-03SenateSenate read second time
2016-02-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-02SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2016-02-02SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2016-02-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=SB1516
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/laws/0079.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/s.15160409.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/s.1516ad.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/s.1516jud.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/1516driggs1154.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/1516driggs0834.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.1516clark.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.1516clark2.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.sgov.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.sjud.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.smotion.11.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.smotion.21.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.smotion.31.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.smotion.41.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.smotion.51.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.helect.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.hcow.2.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.hmotion.12.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.hmotion.22.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.hmotion.32.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.hmotion.42.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.hmotion.52.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1516.hthird.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback