AZ SB1515 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - House EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Adequate water supply; county review

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adequate water supply; county review

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseHouse EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-28HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to House EENR Committee
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-22HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-15SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2018-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11823Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70728
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1515p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1515s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1515griffin.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1515nrew.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70728&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70728&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70728&billStatusActionId=181547&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70728&billStatusActionId=181642&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70728&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback